+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter 56, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed.Ayes, 25; nays, 4--Girod, Hansell, Olsen, Thomsen; excused, 1--Boquist.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Hoyle, Krieger, Sprenger.
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.