+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 22, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 17; nays, 12--Boquist, DeBoer, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Winters; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 04-20 by unanimous consent.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 04-19 by unanimous consent.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Barnhart. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 1--Boone; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Holvey, Lininger.
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -1
Adopted (3/13/2017 11:55:06 AM)
Amendment 1
Proposed (3/13/2017 11:55:06 AM)