+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 69, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
- Governor signed.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed.Ayes, 26; excused, 4--Burdick, George, Johnson, Whitsett.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care and Human Services.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Conger. Passed.Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Dembrow, Fagan, Matthews, McKeown.
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.