+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 49, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Olsen. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 04-24 by unanimous consent.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and General Government.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Boshart Davis. Passed. Ayes, 60.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Work Session held.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.