+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 10, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 621, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
On August 2, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 10, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hass declared potential conflict of interest.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 21; nays, 9--Boquist, Ferrioli, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
- Rules suspended. Second reading.
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On July 5, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Helm. Passed, having received the required three-fifths majority. Ayes, 43; Nays, 16--Barreto, Buehler, Esquivel, Heard, Holvey, Lewis, Marsh, Nearman, Noble, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith Warner, Sprenger, Wilson; Excused, 1--Boone.
- Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Hayden.
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB.
On July 4, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On June 18, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Ways and Means.
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment -7
Adopted (6/30/2017 1:49:35 PM)
Amendment -6
Recommended (6/26/2017 7:14:56 PM)
Amendment -4
Proposed (6/26/2017 12:20:02 PM)
Amendment -5
Proposed (6/23/2017 4:50:04 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (5/17/2017 11:54:07 AM)