+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 119, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 30.
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Workforce.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Doherty. Passed. Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Parrish; Excused, 1--Lininger.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 20, 2017 Calendar.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 19, 2017 Calendar.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (4/7/2017 3:09:10 PM)