+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 5, (2017 Laws): Effective date March 20, 2017.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 30.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Vial. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Boone.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Education.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.