+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 42, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 20; nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Johnson, Kruse, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; excused, 1--Monnes Anderson.
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 05-03 by unanimous consent.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time under Consent Calendar. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Evans, Sprenger, Stark.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be placed on Consent Calendar.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/28/2017 2:09:00 PM)