+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 195, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
- Governor signed.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Johnson.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by McKeown. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 1--Whisnant; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Esquivel, Matthews.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to February 27, 2013 Calendar.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources.
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor