+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 25, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter 452, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
On July 14, 2021 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 22, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
- Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 2--Johnson, Kennemer.
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue.
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Boshart Davis. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Evans; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference.
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Wildfire Recovery with subsequent referral to Revenue.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -2
Adopted (4/2/2021 7:03 AM)