+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 119, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
- Governor signed.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Beyer, Johnson, Kruse.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rural Communities and Economic Development.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time under Consent Calendar. Passed.Ayes, 60.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be placed on Consent Calendar.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources.
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor