+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 6, 2015 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules by order of Speaker.
- Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules.
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation and Economic Development.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment #
4/16/2015 3:01:51 PM
Amendment #5477
4/13/2015 1:45:02 PM
Amendment #5913
4/16/2015 3:01:51 PM
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor