+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 7, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
- Governor signed.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Krieger. Passed.Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Gallegos, Gelser, Hanna, Jenson.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor