+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter 153, (2015 Laws): Effective date May 26, 2015.
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 2--Girod, Thatcher; excused, 2--Burdick, Ferrioli.
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Human Services and Early Childhood.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 1--McLane; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Fagan, Speaker Kotek.
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #4628
3/20/2015 1:56:47 PM
Amendment #4531
3/18/2015 12:41:21 PM