+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On July 22, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter 705, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
On July 20, 2015 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On July 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 3, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Bates. Passed.Ayes, 25; nays, 4--Ferrioli, Johnson, Riley, Shields; excused, 1--Olsen.
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 22, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Whisnant. Passed.Ayes, 50; Nays, 9--Frederick, Hayden, Huffman, Reardon, Smith Warner, Stark, Weidner, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 1--Smith.
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment #
4/14/2015 10:58:41 AM
Amendment #5561
4/14/2015 11:06:33 AM
Amendment #5589
4/14/2015 10:58:41 AM
Amendment #4537
3/17/2015 3:08:54 PM
Amendment #5560
3/17/2015 3:08:54 PM