+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On July 6, 2015 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment #
4/16/2015 11:32:21 AM
Amendment #6098
4/16/2015 11:32:21 AM
Amendment #5862
4/16/2015 11:32:21 AM
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor