+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On July 6, 2015 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules by order of Speaker.
- Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules.
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Energy and Environment.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #
4/16/2015 1:30:51 PM
Amendment #5908
4/16/2015 1:30:51 PM
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor