+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 66, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
- Governor signed.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed.Ayes, 26; excused, 4--Burdick, George, Johnson, Whitsett.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time under Consent Calendar. Passed.Ayes, 54; Excused, 5--Johnson, Kennemer, Matthews, Olson, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass and be placed on Consent Calendar.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Efficiency.
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor