+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 30, 2019 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment -4
Adopted (4/1/2019 10:15 PM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (3/22/2019 4:04 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (3/22/2019 4:04 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (3/22/2019 4:04 PM)