+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 23, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 527, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 15, 2019.
On July 15, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 1--Bentz.
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Evans. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Rayfield.
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On June 7, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -A3
Adopted (6/6/2019 6:50 PM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (4/3/2019 2:20 PM)