+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 21, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 393, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2019.
On June 17, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 7, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 54; Nays, 6--Barreto, Bonham, Hayden, Reschke, Smith DB, Wilson.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Wagner. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 6--Boquist, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Linthicum, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 05-22 by unanimous consent.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB, Wallan.
- Third reading. Carried by Helt. Passed. Ayes, 48; Nays, 12--Barreto, Bonham, Evans, Findley, Hayden, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Wilson.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Education.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (5/11/2019 10:35 AM)