+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 25, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 643, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 25, 2013.
- Governor signed.
On July 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 3, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist.
- Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 16; nays, 14--Baertschiger, Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Starr, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters.
On June 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Komp. Passed.Ayes, 35; Nays, 25--Bentz, Berger, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Smith, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett.
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Education.
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor