+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter 311, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Devlin.
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Boone. Passed.Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Nearman; Excused, 2--Reardon, Stark.
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Energy and Environment.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment #
4/13/2015 2:53:41 PM
Amendment #5488
4/13/2015 2:53:41 PM
Amendment #5173
4/7/2015 7:29:16 AM
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor