+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter 67, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2016.
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 4--Boquist, Girod, Thatcher, Thomsen.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed.Ayes, 55; Nays, 2--McLane, Parrish; Excused, 3--Buckley, Taylor, Williamson.
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Education.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.