+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On September 25, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter 613, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 27, 2021.
On July 27, 2021 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 29, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 4--Girod, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Heard, Manning Jr.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Helm. Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 12--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Levy, Lewis, Morgan, Post, Reschke, Stark, Wallan, Zika; Excused, 1--Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 10--Bynum, Drazan, Gomberg, Leif, McLain, Nosse, Rayfield, Sanchez, Smith Warner, Speaker Kotek.
- Second reading.
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On June 22, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -2
Adopted (3/15/2021 5:53 PM)
Amendment -A4
Adopted (6/22/2021 12:06 PM)