+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 202, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed. Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Boquist, Olsen, Steiner Hayward.
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Lininger. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 19, 2017 Calendar.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 18, 2017 Calendar.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Economic Development and Trade with subsequent referral to Revenue.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.