+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education and Workforce Development.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed.Ayes, 35; Nays, 25--Bentz, Berger, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Huffman, Jenson, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development.
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment #1537
Adopted
Amendment #1538
Adopted
Amendment #1211
Not Adopted
Amendment #1534
Not Adopted
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor