+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 201, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 26; nays, 1--Linthicum; excused, 3--Boquist, Olsen, Steiner Hayward.
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Nearman; Excused, 2--Alonso Leon, Boone.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Economic Development and Trade.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment 1
Proposed (2/9/2017 11:19:40 AM)
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/9/2017 11:19:40 AM)