+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (3)
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -2
Adopted (4/9/2015 4:01:27 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (3/20/2015 10:26:23 AM)