+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 26, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter 507, (2015 Laws): Effective date October 05, 2015.
On June 22, 2015 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed.Ayes, 25; nays, 3--Olsen, Thatcher, Whitsett; excused, 2--Beyer, Thomsen.
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue.
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed.Ayes, 49; Nays, 10--Barreto, Barton, Buckley, Esquivel, Lininger, Nathanson, Post, Smith Warner, Weidner, Whitsett; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #6537
5/7/2015 8:19:17 AM
Amendment #6488
5/7/2015 8:19:17 AM
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor