+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 33, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 27; nays, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Girod, Thomsen.
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 05-03 by unanimous consent.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Human Services.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Malstrom. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Boone, Speaker Kotek.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor