+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 25, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter 210, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
On June 11, 2021 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 26; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 3--Findley, Frederick, Thatcher.
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Williams. Passed. Ayes, 52; Excused, 6--Levy, Lively, Morgan, Nearman, Reynolds, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Nosse, Rayfield.
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
- Public Hearing held.
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services by order of Speaker.
- Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Human Services.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Civil Law.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -2
Adopted (4/1/2021 8:55 AM)