+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 133, (2019 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2019.
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 8--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Winters.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Hernandez. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Bynum, Keny-Guyer, Leif, Piluso.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.