+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 26, 2021 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On June 4, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Tax Expenditures by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed B-Engrossed, and be referred to Tax Expenditures.
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Housing with subsequent referral to Revenue.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -1
Adopted (3/7/2021 9:45 PM)
Amendment -A2
Adopted (5/4/2021 8:36 PM)