+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 25, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter 55, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
On May 21, 2021 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Heard, Robinson.
- Third reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 6--Boquist, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Evans. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Clem, Noble, Power.
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar.
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to March 31, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to March 30, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to March 29, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Management.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.