+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 1, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 569, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
- Governor signed.
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 06-20 by unanimous consent.
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 06-19 by unanimous consent.
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Freeman. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Kennemer.
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #1073
Adopted
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor