+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 31, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Johnson.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 05-02 by unanimous consent.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Evans, Smith G.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to March 13, 2017 Calendar.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Economic Development and Trade.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor