+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 191, (2013 Laws): Effective date October 7, 2013.
- Governor signed.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Close.
- Third reading. Carried by Burdick. Passed.Ayes, 17; nays, 12--Baertschiger, Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 1--Johnson.
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Barnhart. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 3--Freeman, Hicks, Weidner; Excused, 1--Thatcher.
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #397
Adopted
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor