+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 25, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter 513, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2021.
On July 19, 2021 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Lieber. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 10--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Absent, 1--Kennemer; Excused, 1--Manning Jr.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 21, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 21--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 2--Morgan, Prusak.
- Second reading.
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On June 18, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 16, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 14, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On June 13, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.