+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 14, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 647, (2019 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2019.
On August 9, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 2, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation filed by Steiner Hayward.
- Baertschiger Jr, Thomsen, granted unanimous consent to change vote to aye.
- Hass declared potential conflict of interest.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 3--Olsen, Prozanski, Taylor; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist.
- Rules suspended. Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Smith DB. Passed. Ayes, 43; Nays, 14--Fahey, Greenlick, Helm, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Marsh, Nathanson, Nosse, Rayfield, Salinas, Sanchez, Smith Warner, Wilde, Zika; Excused, 2--Boles, Clem; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 25, 2019 Calendar.
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 17, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On June 13, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session cancelled.
On June 7, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means.
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing cancelled.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -3
Adopted (6/18/2019 7:31 AM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (6/14/2019 3:45 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (6/14/2019 3:44 PM)