+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On June 9, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Tax Credits by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Tax Credits by prior reference.
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Energy and Environment with subsequent referral to Tax Credits.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (3/28/2017 6:21:55 PM)