+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 100, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Thatcher, Winters.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Witt. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 2--Mitchell, Sanchez; Excused, 1--Keny-Guyer.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded.
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (3/4/2019 2:25 PM)