+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 364, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
- Governor signed.
On June 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 7, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Baertschiger. Passed.Ayes, 29; nays, 1--Girod.
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection.
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed.Ayes, 35; Nays, 22--Barker, Barton, Bentz, Cameron, Conger, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Huffman, Jenson, Johnson, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Richardson, Smith, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whitsett; Excused, 3--Fagan, McKeown, Sprenger.
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #234
Adopted
Amendment #204
Adopted
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor