+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 25, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter 350, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 01, 2021.
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 2--Boquist, Girod; Absent, 1--Linthicum; Excused, 3--Heard, Kennemer, Thatcher.
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Smith Warner. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Hayden, Ruiz, Sanchez, Smith G.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to refer to Rules carried. Referred.
- Third reading.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading commenced. Carried over to March 22, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -4
Adopted (5/12/2021 10:06 AM)
Amendment -2
Combined (4/28/2021 12:57 PM)
Amendment -3
Combined (4/28/2021 11:29 AM)