+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On September 25, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter 20, (2021 Laws): Effective date May 12, 2021.
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 2--Linthicum, Thatcher; Excused, 2--Heard, Johnson.
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Labor and Business.
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Cate. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 5--Evans, Leif, Rayfield, Reardon, Zika.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Economic Recovery and Prosperity.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.