+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter 308, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Beyer, Johnson.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Huffman. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rural Communities, Land Use and Water.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #
4/2/2015 9:52:58 AM
Amendment #4917
4/2/2015 9:52:58 AM