+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On July 6, 2015 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #4443
3/18/2015 12:41:10 PM
Amendment #3981
2/18/2015 12:58:32 PM