+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On September 25, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter 107, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
- Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 12--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Energy and Environment.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Wilde.
- Motion to rerefer to General Government failed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 36--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Campos, Dexter, Evans, Fahey, Gomberg, Grayber, Helm, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Lively, Marsh, McLain, Meek, Nathanson, Neron, Nosse, Pham, Power, Prusak, Rayfield, Reardon, Reynolds, Ruiz, Salinas, Sanchez, Schouten, Smith Warner, Sollman, Speaker Kotek, Valderrama, Wilde, Williams, Witt; Excused, 2--Boshart Davis, Clem.
- Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 20--Bonham, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Nearman, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 2--Boshart Davis, Clem.
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar.
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to March 31, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to March 30, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to March 29, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to General Government.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -3
Adopted (3/10/2021 12:05 PM)