+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 14, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 701, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 9, 2019.
On August 9, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 30, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 10--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boles, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Knopp, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to refer to Rules failed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 38--Alonso Leon, Barker, Bynum, Clem, Doherty, Evans, Fahey, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Helt, Hernandez, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Lively, Marsh, McKeown, McLain, Meek, Mitchell, Nathanson, Neron, Nosse, Piluso, Power, Prusak, Rayfield, Reardon, Salinas, Sanchez, Schouten, Smith Warner, Sollman, Speaker Kotek, Wilde, Williams, Williamson.
- Third reading. Carried by Hernandez, Alonso Leon.
- Passed. Ayes, 39; Nays, 21--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Leif, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Witt, Zika.
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Evans, Mitchell, Noble.
On June 17, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
- Work Session held.
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Ways and Means.
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment -9
Adopted (6/12/2019 5:50 PM)
Amendment -6
Proposed (5/20/2019 12:15 PM)
Amendment -5
Proposed (5/17/2019 11:06 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (4/16/2019 11:48 AM)