+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 281, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Speaker Kotek, Hack. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 3--Gorsek, Johnson, McKeown; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Rayfield, Smith Warner, Williamson.
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules by order of Speaker.
- Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -6
Adopted (5/2/2017 10:03:28 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (4/17/2017 9:45:45 AM)